Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Carcarasio

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1638AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
25 Apr 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
24 Jan 1643DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Carcarasio
Bishop Giovanni Battista Carcarasio (died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 101, Number 610
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast