Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Farnese

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1599BornParma, Italy
11 Apr 163939.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
26 Apr 163939.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
9 Apr 165757.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Apr 165858.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 May 165858.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
18 Feb 166868.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Farnese:
Girolamo Cardinal Farnese (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 276
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 624
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1639, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015