Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvise Marcello, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
17 Sep 163540.7AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
21 Sep 163540.7Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
15 Dec 165358.9AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
16 Jul 166166.5DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvise Marcello
Bishop Alvise Marcello C.R.S. (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314, and Page 283
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 96, Number 574
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017