Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo de’ Rustici, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornNapoli
16 Mar 163738.2AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
29 Mar 163738.2Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
14 Dec 164345.0AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
28 Oct 165253.8DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo de’ Rustici:
Bishop Pietro Paolo de’ Rustici O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Isernia

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 333, and Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 592

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013