Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Altieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1671Born
13 Nov 169019.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Nov 169019.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
29 Aug 170029.2Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
8 Jun 170735.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
14 Nov 171847.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
24 Jul 173059.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
3 Aug 174170.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Altieri
Lorenzo Cardinal Altieri (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 50.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Nov 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017