Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bombay

Archidioecesis Bombayensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Oswald Gracias, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Dominic Savio Fernandes, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Allwyn D’Silva, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Percival Joseph Fernandez, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Agnelo Rufino Gracias, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Bosco Penha, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 9,731 (3,758 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://archdioceseofbombay.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 21 Nathalal Parekh Marg, Mumbai-400001, India
  • Telephone: (022)2202.10.93; 2202.11.93
  • Fax: 2285.38.72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur
1637ErectedArchdiocese of Goa Vicariate Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)
1669Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Idalcan / Deccan / Bijapur Vicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)
1704Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals) Prefecture Apostolic of Tibet (erected)
1769Territory AddedPrefecture Apostolic of Tibet (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)
17 May 1784Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Hindustan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bombay
1820Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals) Vicariate Apostolic of Bombay
8 March 1854Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bombay Vicariate Apostolic of Poona (erected)
Archdiocese of Bombay
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bombay Archdiocese of Bombay
25 January 1930Territory AddedDiocese of Poona (Khandala and Kune) Archdiocese of Bombay
1934Territory LostArchdiocese of Bombay (Northern and central part of Quierat, from the river Mahi to the region of Sind, the whole peninsula of Kathiavar and the island of Gutch) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Ahmedabad (erected)
20 May 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Bombay (Sind and Baluchistan) Diocese of Karachi (erected)
29 September 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Bombay (Panchmahals, Baroda, Broach, Surat, and Dangs (all in Gujarat)) Diocese of Baroda (erected)
30 April 1988Territory LostArchdiocese of Bombay
Diocese of Nashik
Diocese of Poona
Diocese of Kalyan (Syro-Malabar) (erected) (Syro-Malabar Faithful)
22 May 1998Territory LostArchdiocese of Bombay (Vasai, Bhiwandi, Shahapur, Wada, Jawahar, Palghar, Mokhada, Dahanu, and Talasari (all in Thane)) Diocese of Vasai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Bombay
1950209,00010,500,0002.0%16712028772812025386ap1951
1959298,43510,783,7952.8%19514233788521846285ap1960
1970400,8626,863,5475.8%2722234958093691,01599ap1971
1980518,4869,703,0005.3%3002385389634041,343103ap1981
1990565,50414,880,0003.8%3312726039374101,517122ap1991
1999544,17714,636,9313.7%3062635699563571,41286ap2000
2000506,64814,661,6453.5%2912655569113701,42886ap2001
2001485,79014,661,6453.3%2832785618653641,428114ap2002
2002491,69714,661,6453.4%2862715578823831,435113ap2003
2003497,85014,955,0003.3%2852805658813701,486114ap2004
2004503,71415,205,0003.3%2862625489193581,500116ap2005
2006506,97619,444,2032.6%2772835609053831,530118ap2007
2012525,01720,399,0002.6%28431059488394011,587122ap2013
2015517,00121,204,0002.4%294311605854103981,616123ap2016
2018509,79421,901,6202.3%293320613831153991,605124ap2019
2020503,88821,928,2002.3%280324604834163941,563124ap2021
2022491,24921,691,1162.3%265312577851153751,538124ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 118
  • Archdiocese of Bombay
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 450
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 7 Apr 2024