Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hermann Jürgens (Juergens), S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bombay, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1847Born
1884¹36.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 May 190759.4AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
14 Jul 190759.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
28 Sep 191668.8DiedArchbishop of Bombay, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann Jürgens (Juergens)
Archbishop Hermann Jürgens (Juergens) S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopBombay, Archdiocese of Bombay

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 38
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast