Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Roberts, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1893Born
20 Sep 192532.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Aug 193744.4AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
21 Sep 193744.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
4 Dec 195057.7ResignedArchbishop of Bombay, India
4 Dec 195057.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sugdaea
7 Dec 197077.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Sugdaea
28 Feb 197682.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Roberts
Archbishop Thomas Roberts S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Havre, France

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 56
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 410, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast