Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Savio Fernandes

Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India

Titular Bishop of Cozyla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1954 Born
8 Apr 198935.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
15 May 201359.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
15 May 201359.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cozyla
29 Jun 201359.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cozyla

MicroData Summary for Dominic Savio Fernandes
Bishop Dominic Savio Fernandes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMumbai
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Church, Mahim, Archdiocese of Bombay

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 15 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 29 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast