Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odilon Fages, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Orange River

Titular Bishop of Mulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1875BornLa Capelle, France
25 Mar 189923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
15 Jun 192852.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa
15 Jun 192852.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulia
30 Sep 192852.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulia
21 Nov 193257.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa
14 Oct 193964.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Orange River, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Odilon Fages:
Bishop Odilon Fages O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Orange River

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1928, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013