Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Camille Michel Stenger

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1946 BornPhalsbourg
28 Jun 197528.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 199952.7AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
5 Sep 199953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Marc Camille Michel Stenger:
Bishop Marc Camille Michel Stenger (born ) Bishop of Troyes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Troyes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,602

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 May 2014