Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Champion de Cicé

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1725BornRennes
2 Feb 175833.0SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
2 Aug 175833.5ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
3 Sep 175833.6Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
8 Jan 176135.9SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
14 Feb 176136.0ResignedBishop of Troyes, France
16 Feb 176136.0ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Nov 180580.8DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie Champion de Cicé:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Champion de Cicé (born , died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 89, and Page 413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013