Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond Bennetat, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Eucarpia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1713BornTroyes, France
25 Mar 173723.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Sep 174532.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
22 Sep 174532.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
1 May 174835.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
16 Jul 175845.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
22 May 176148.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Edmond Bennetat:
Bishop Edmond Bennetat M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013