Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Louis-David de Séguin des Hons

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1760BornCastres
6 Jun 178928.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 182564.6SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
19 Dec 182565.1ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
26 Feb 182665.3Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
31 Aug 184382.8DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Louis-David de Séguin des Hons
Bishop Jacques-Louis-David de Séguin des Hons (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016