Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne-Marie de Boulogne

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1747BornAvignon
1771¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 180860.2SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
11 Jul 180860.5ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
2 Feb 180961.1Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
9 Sep 181769.7SelectedBishop of Vienne, France
1 Oct 181769.7ConfirmedBishop of Vienne, France
25 Feb 182577.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Troyes, France
13 May 182577.3DiedBishop of Troyes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Marie de Boulogne:
Archbishop Etienne-Marie de Boulogne (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 375, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015