Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Caracciolo, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1515¹Born
5 Apr 153924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
5 Oct 155136.7AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
15 Nov 155136.8Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
31 Mar 156348.2ResignedBishop of Troyes, France
29 Aug 157055.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Caracciolo (VIAF: 291827080)
Bishop Antoine Caracciolo C.R.S.A. (born 1515, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopInfirmary, Saint-Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 317
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,348
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast