Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Petit, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1519AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
18 Sep 1527AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
8 Dec 1536DiedBishop of Senlis, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Petit
Bishop Guillaume Petit O.P. (died ) Bishop of Senlis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevilliers, Archdiocese of Rouen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300, and Page 317
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast