Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Dinteville

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1498Born
18 Mar 152728.6AppointedBishop of Riez, France
27 Apr 153031.7AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
27 Sep 155658.1DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for François de Dinteville
Bishop François de Dinteville (born , died ) Bishop of Auxerre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroyes, Diocese of Troyes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1527, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jun 2018

Quantcast