Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yves François Patenôtre

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1940 BornTroyes
29 Jun 196525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Troyes, France
1 Dec 199454.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
29 Jan 199555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
30 Jul 200464.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
30 Jul 200464.5AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
29 Aug 200464.5InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
31 Dec 200464.9SucceededArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
31 Dec 200464.9SucceededPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
5 Mar 201575.1RetiredArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
5 Mar 201575.1RetiredPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary for Yves François Patenôtre:
Archbishop Yves François Patenôtre (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,484
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 1 Aug 2015