Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Mathias-Joseph de Barral

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1714BornGrenoble
8 Jan 176146.3SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
16 Feb 176146.4ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
29 Mar 176146.6Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
22 Dec 179076.3RetiredBishop of Troyes, France
1 Feb 180388.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Mathias-Joseph de Barral:
Bishop Claude-Mathias-Joseph de Barral (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Troyes

  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013