Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Dvornikovich

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641¹BornGyor
16 Dec 168645.9SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
24 Nov 168746.8ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
1688¹47.0Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
3 Oct 169251.7SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
14 Nov 169554.8ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
1705¹64.0DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mihály Dvornikovich:
Bishop Mihály Dvornikovich (born 1641, died 1705) Bishop of Vác

  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 177, and Page 402
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015