Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gáspár Lischerong, S.J. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Daming [Taming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1889Born
29 Jun 191122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jul 194758.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Daming [Taming], China
17 Jan 197283.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Daming [Taming], China

MicroData Summary for Gáspár Lischerong (VIAF: 166740782)
Father Gáspár Lischerong S.J. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Daming [Taming]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlerk, Diocese of Csanád, Hungary
Death PlaceChiayi, Taiwan

  • a priest for 60.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast