Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Lonovics

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1793³BornMiskolcz
4 Jun 181522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Apr 181623.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 183441.1SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
23 Jun 183441.3ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
14 Sep 183441.6Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
Feb 1850³57.0ResignedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
29 Mar 186168.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
27 Nov 186673.8AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
13 Mar 186774.1DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Lonovics (VIAF: 89193911)
Archbishop József Lonovics (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 215
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016