Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lörinc (Vavrinec) Cardinal Schlauch

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1824Born
2 Jan 184722.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Csanád, Hungary
3 Apr 184723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Csanád, Hungary
17 Mar 187348.9SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
25 Jul 187349.3ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Sep 187349.4Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
8 Apr 188763.0SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
26 May 188763.1ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
12 Jun 189369.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 189470.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
10 Jul 190278.2DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Lörinc (Vavrinec) Schlauch (VIAF: 89681551)
Lörinc (Vavrinec) Cardinal Schlauch (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUj-Arad, Diocese of Csanád, Hungary
Ordained BishopCathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Death PlaceNagyvárad, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}
Buried Place (Original)Family Crypt, Temesvár

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1893
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 359, and Page 532
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017