Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Annabring

Deceased

Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1900Born
3 May 192727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
27 Jan 195453.8AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
25 Mar 195454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
27 Aug 195959.4DiedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Annabring
Bishop Joseph John Annabring (born , died ) Bishop of Superior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzataryliget, Hungary

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018