Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Vorbuchner

Deceased

Bishop of Alba Iulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1890BornArad
21 Sep 191424.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 193646.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
18 Apr 193646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
7 Jun 193646.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
28 May 193848.1SucceededBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
10 Sep 193848.4DiedBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Vorbuchner:
Bishop Adolfo Vorbuchner (born , died ) Bishop of Alba Iulia

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015