Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Pusky

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornGyor
16 Apr 164048.2AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
9 Sep 164048.6Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
6 Aug 164351.5SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
1645²53.0AppointedAdministrator of Nitra, Slovakia
1648²56.0ResignedAdministrator of Nitra, Slovakia
14 Feb 165058.1AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
1651²59.0AppointedAdministrator of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1657²65.0ResignedAdministrator of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1659¹67.0DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pusky:
Archbishop Giovanni Pusky (born 1592, died 1659) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 207, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 356
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015