Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Nádasdy, O.S.Pauli †

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1662Born
15 Jun 171048.0SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
15 Dec 171048.5ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
22 Mar 171148.7Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
25 Nov 172967.4DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Nádasdy
Bishop László Nádasdy O.S.Pauli (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlacePresbourg
Ordained BishopWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast