Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Kräuter

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Timişoara, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1922Born
2 Jun 194623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Timişoara, Romania
14 Mar 199067.2AppointedBishop of Timişoara, Romania
28 Apr 199067.3Ordained BishopBishop of Timişoara, Romania
24 Jun 199976.5RetiredBishop of Timişoara, Romania
29 Jan 200885.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Timişoara, Romania

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Kräuter (VIAF: 42698099)
Bishop Sebastian Kräuter (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Timişoara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNitzkydorf

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,872
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 May 2018

Quantcast