Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Anton von Engel in Wagrain

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1702³BornMilbach
22 Dec 172523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Mar 172725.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 173331.6SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
5 May 173432.3ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
15 Jul 175048.5SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
7 Dec 175048.9ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
Jan 1777³74.9DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton von Engel in Wagrain:
Bishop Franz Anton von Engel in Wagrain (born ) Bishop of Csanád

  • a priest for 49.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 119, and Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013