Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Josip Cardinal Mihalović

Deceased

Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1814Born
18 Apr 183521.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Aug 183622.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 187056.3SelectedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
27 Jun 187056.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
17 Jul 187056.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
22 Jun 187763.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 187763.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
19 Feb 189177.0DiedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Mihalović (VIAF: 316739258)
Josip Cardinal Mihalović (born , died ) Archbishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorda, Diocese of Csanád, Hungary
Ordained BishopDominican church, Vienna
Death PlaceZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 600, and Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017