Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Török

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1761³BornFöldvar
29 Aug 182968.2SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
15 Mar 183068.7ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
13 Jun 183069.0Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
6 Apr 183270.8DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antal Török
Bishop Antal Török (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 168
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016