Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbertus von Falkenstein, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1681¹BornFreiburg
23 Oct 173049.8SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
21 May 173150.3ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
25 Nov 173150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
27 Sep 173958.7DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalbertus von Falkenstein:
Bishop Adalbertus von Falkenstein O.S.B. (born 1681, died ) Bishop of Csanád

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015