Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Köszeghy von Romete

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1748BornSzeged
18 Oct 176517.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 May 177627.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
1 Jun 177627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Aug 180052.1SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
22 Dec 180052.5ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
10 May 180152.9Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
4 Jan 182879.5DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Köszeghy von Romete:
Bishop László Köszeghy von Romete (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013