Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Micozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1881BornRoma
15 May 190725.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 192139.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
22 Jul 192139.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
7 Aug 192140.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
23 Dec 192746.4AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
20 May 192846.8InstalledBishop of Teramo, Italy
4 Sep 194463.1DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Micozzi:
Bishop Antonio Micozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 56
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013