Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brandimarte Tommasi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy

Titular Bishop of Salamis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591²Born
26 Sep 163342.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
26 Sep 163342.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Salamis
9 Oct 163342.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salamis
22 Jul 164857.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Brandimarte Tommasi
Bishop Brandimarte Tommasi (born 1591, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRipatransone, Diocese of Ripatransone
Ordained BishopPaoline Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMagliano Sabina, Diocese of Sabina
Buried Place (Original)San Liberatore, Cathedral, Magliano Sabina, Diocese of Sabina

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017