Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilelmus Zerbi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1756BornSaronno
20 Mar 177922.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181862.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
2 Oct 181862.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
4 Oct 181862.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
27 Jun 182569.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Jun 182569.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
18 Aug 184185.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guilelmus Zerbi
Bishop Guilelmus Zerbi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 56, and Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016