Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Forlani

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1710Born
1 Feb 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 175040.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
23 Sep 175040.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
27 Sep 175040.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
19 Dec 175747.7AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
5 Jun 176555.2AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
5 Mar 178777.0DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Forlani
Bishop Francesco Maria Forlani (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapranica

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,750, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast