Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Leli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1711³BornCesi, Croatia
8 Sep 173625.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 177160.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
16 Dec 177160.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
2 Feb 177967.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Antonio Leli:
Bishop Antonio Leli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262, and Page 451
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015