Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurentius Odorisi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

Titular Bishop of Tempe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1674BornVisso
21 Dec 169723.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 174773.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
18 Dec 174773.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
21 Dec 174773.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tempe

MicroData Summary for Laurentius Odorisi:
Bishop Laurentius Odorisi Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013