Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Angelini

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1777Born
7 Jun 180023.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 183962.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
8 Jul 183962.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
21 Jul 183962.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
26 Jun 185174.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Angelini
Bishop Domenico Angelini (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca
Ordained BishopSte. Trinite des Pellerins, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,839, Number 13
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast