Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Piccolomini

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹Born
1600²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 163055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
18 Feb 163055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Salamis
24 Feb 163055.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salamis
20 Jun 163358.4AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
14 Jul 163762.5DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Piccolomini
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Piccolomini (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienne

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155, and Page 301
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,890
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,630, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast