Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Boccaccio

Deceased

Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1938BornRoma
9 Mar 196324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Oct 198749.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
29 Oct 198749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
7 Dec 198749.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
17 Mar 199253.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy
30 Jul 199254.1SucceededBishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy
9 Jul 199961.0AppointedBishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy
18 Oct 200870.3DiedBishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Boccaccio:
Bishop Salvatore Boccaccio (born , died ) Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,911
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014