Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Fumagalli

Bishop of Viterbo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1947 BornRoma
24 Jul 197124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
31 Dec 199952.6AppointedBishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy
20 Feb 200052.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy
11 Dec 201063.6AppointedBishop of Viterbo, Italy
27 Feb 201163.8InstalledBishop of Viterbo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lino Fumagalli:
Bishop Lino Fumagalli (born ) Bishop of Viterbo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viterbo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,701
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013