Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bruni, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

Titular Bishop of Lydda

Titular See: (Philippe di Santa Catharina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1715BornRoma
Nov 1732³17.2ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
22 Jun 173822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
5 Aug 176550.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
5 Aug 176550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
11 Aug 176550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
21 Sep 177156.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bruni:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bruni Sch. P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 270, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015