Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Emanuel (Emmanuel), S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia

Titular Bishop of Aezani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1872BornGassino Torinese
8 Jun 189522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Apr 192956.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy
18 Apr 192956.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
19 May 192956.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
12 Nov 193664.2AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Apr 195279.6RetiredBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Apr 195279.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
2 Jan 196289.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Emanuel (Emmanuel):
Bishop Federico Emanuel (Emmanuel) S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013