Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Marco Palmerini

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1671³BornRimini
17 Mar 169624.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Apr 169624.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 171341.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
30 Jan 171341.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
5 Feb 171341.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
1 Jul 171645.1AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
2 Oct 173160.3DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Marco Palmerini:
Bishop Simone Marco Palmerini (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1731
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 101, and Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015