Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Mirra

Deceased

Bishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1835Born
30 Mar 186125.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 189862.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
15 Mar 189862.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
20 Mar 189862.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
15 Apr 190771.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Axomis
31 Aug 190872.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
11 Mar 191781.5DiedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Mirra (VIAF: 232924527)
Archbishop Bartolomeo Mirra (born , died ) Bishop of Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazzano Romano
Ordained BishopVilla Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 94
  • c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,405
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 238, and Page 76
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,898, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast