Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Masera

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1867Born
21 Dec 188922.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 190639.1AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
28 Oct 190639.3Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
2 Dec 191245.4ResignedBishop of Biella, Italy
2 Dec 191245.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
2 Dec 191245.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
13 Jun 192153.9AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
18 Feb 192658.6DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Masera
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Masera (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoncalieri

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 134, and Page 95
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast