Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Deodato Baiardi, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1700³BornRignano
22 Nov 172222.0Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
3 Mar 173837.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
3 Mar 173837.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
16 Mar 173837.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
18 Dec 174747.1AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
28 Nov 177676.0DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Deodato Baiardi:
Bishop Deodato Baiardi O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013